MN HF2552 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eligibility for recovery community organizations modified, Minnesota Board of Recovery Services created, rulemaking authority provided, and application fee established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligibility for recovery community organizations modified, Minnesota Board of Recovery Services created, rulemaking authority provided, and application fee established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2023-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance
2023-03-16HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2023-03-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance
2023-03-02HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2490 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback