MN HF2409 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Police civilian review uniform authority procedures provided.
Title
Police civilian review uniform authority procedures provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2012-03-30 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1981 |
2012-03-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2409&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2409&version=0&session=ls87 |