MN HF2307 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Guaranty association coverage written disclosure permitted when a policy is delivered, and access expanded to accident reports to include all parties involved.
Title
Guaranty association coverage written disclosure permitted when a policy is delivered, and access expanded to accident reports to include all parties involved.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Tim Sanders [R] |
Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2012-03-29 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1875 |
2012-02-29 | House | Author added Dittrich |
2012-02-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2307&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2307&version=0&session=ls87 |