MN HF212 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pesticide control ordinances for cities of the first class state preemption eliminated.
Title
Pesticide control ordinances for cities of the first class state preemption eliminated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Hausman |
2019-01-31 | House | Authors added Wazlawik, Bierman |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Sauke |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1157 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy