MN HF1999 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legacy finance and policy bill.
Title
Legacy finance and policy bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1999 (Y: 101 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1999 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: CALL OF THE HOUSE (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H1999A12 (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H1999A17 (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Baker - Amendment - H1999A11 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Backer - Amendment - H1999A14 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Pfarr - Amendment - H1999A15 (Y: 59 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1999 (Y: 101 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1999 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: CALL OF THE HOUSE (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H1999A12 (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Heintzeman - Amendment - H1999A17 (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Baker - Amendment - H1999A11 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Backer - Amendment - H1999A14 (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Pfarr - Amendment - H1999A15 (Y: 59 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 40 | |
2023-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2023-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2023-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2023-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-05-10 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2023-05-10 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2023-05-09 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2023-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2023-05-09 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2023-05-09 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate conferees Hawj; Morrison; Mohamed; Pha; Housley |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2023-04-19 | Senate | House conferees Lillie; Hussein; Her; Cha; Backer |
2023-04-19 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2023-04-19 | House | Senate conferees Hawj; Morrison; Mohamed; Pha; Housley |
2023-04-19 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2023-04-18 | House | House conferees Lillie, Hussein, Her, Cha, Backer |
2023-04-18 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2023-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-04-12 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2023-04-12 | House | Third reading as amended |
2023-04-12 | House | Amended |
2023-04-12 | House | Amendments offered |
2023-04-11 | House | Author stricken Skraba |
2023-04-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 12, 2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Second reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-03-20 | House | Author added Skraba |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Legacy Finance |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF1682 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance