MN HF1994 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gifted and talented education program provisions modified and funding increased.
Title
Gifted and talented education program provisions modified and funding increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] |
Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Pierson |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Lippert |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Masin |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2021-03-11 | House | Authors added Mariani and Olson, L. |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Theis |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1700 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Authors added Clausen; Champion