MN HF1994 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin County; provisions modified applying to the financing of campaigns for elections and for certain political subdivisions.
Title
Hennepin County; provisions modified applying to the financing of campaigns for elections and for certain political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-08 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Government Operations |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2241 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections