MN HF190 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Authors added Edelson and Masin
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Authors added Edelson and Masin
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide parent-to-parent programs for families of children and youth with special health care needs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Statewide parent-to-parent programs for families of children and youth with special health care needs funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Authors added Edelson and Masin |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF215 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Author added Clausen