MN HF190 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-26 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Golden Valley; operating rate for facility specified.
Title
Golden Valley; operating rate for facility specified.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-01-29 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2015-01-20 | House | Author added Newton. |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF109 (Similar To) 2015-01-15 - Referred to Finance