MN HF1890 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Division action, to pass and return to Taxes
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Division action, to pass and return to Taxes
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bovine tuberculosis property tax credit revived.
Title
Bovine tuberculosis property tax credit revived.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | House | Division action, to pass and return to Taxes |
2012-03-06 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2012-02-13 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Taxes |
2012-01-30 | House | Authors added Kiel |
2012-01-24 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Agriculture and Rural Development Policy and Finance |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1890&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF1890&version=0&session=ls87 |