MN HF1471 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax provisions modified, and property tax exemption modified for airport property.
Title
Property tax provisions modified, and property tax exemption modified for airport property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Davids |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1289 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Author added Weber