MN HF1459 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer protection violation civil remedies amended for individual or family farmer.
Title
Consumer protection violation civil remedies amended for individual or family farmer.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] |
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF1332 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Second reading