MN HF1410 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author added Layman.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author added Layman.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care business start-up and expansion grants provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Child care business start-up and expansion grants provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Layman. |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1512 (Similar To) 2017-02-27 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy