MN HF1407 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Science, technology, engineering, and math activities grant funding provided; and money appropriated.
Title
Science, technology, engineering, and math activities grant funding provided; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Author added Clardy |
2023-02-13 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2707 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Referred to Education Finance