MN HF1358 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminally ill adult end-of-life option established.
Title
Terminally ill adult end-of-life option established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Reyer |
2022-03-10 | House | Author stricken Ecklund |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Wazlawik |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Frazier |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2022-01-31 | House | Authors added Her, Hollins and Ecklund |
2021-04-16 | House | Authors added Long and Sandell |
2021-04-14 | House | Author added Lippert |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Elkins |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Lee |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Morrison and Edelson |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Youakim |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1352 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Authors added Murphy; Klein; McEwen