MN HF1314 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Faculty members and resident dentists permitted to enroll as medical assistance providers.
Title
Faculty members and resident dentists permitted to enroll as medical assistance providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1405 (Similar To) 2015-03-05 - Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing