MN HF1219 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Metropolitan Airports Commission meetings with broad public interest required to be held outside of the airport security area.
Title
Metropolitan Airports Commission meetings with broad public interest required to be held outside of the airport security area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Policy |
2013-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |