MN HF1200 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Paid family, pregnancy, bonding, and applicant's serious medical condition benefits provided; employment leaves regulated and required; data classified; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid family, pregnancy, bonding, and applicant's serious medical condition benefits provided; employment leaves regulated and required; data classified; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2021-03-17HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
2021-03-15HouseAuthors added Wazlawik and Feist
2021-03-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
2021-03-10HouseAuthor added Hanson, J.
2021-03-10HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
2021-03-08HouseAuthor added Freiberg
2021-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
2021-03-01HouseAuthors added Her and Wolgamott
2021-02-25HouseAuthors added Keeler, Greenman, Huot, Hassan and Lillie
2021-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections
2021-02-22HouseAuthors added Stephenson, Lippert, Boldon, Becker-Finn, Kotyza-Witthuhn, Lee, Ecklund, Pinto, Schultz, Noor, Klevorn, Moller, Winkler, Youakim, Berg, Hollins, Vang, Long, Thompson and Agbaje
2021-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1205 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Author added Bakk

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback