MN SF1205 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Paid family leave and medical leave benefits and appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid family leave and medical leave benefits and appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders (Y: 31 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12SenateMotion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
2021-03-08SenateAuthor added Bakk
2021-02-22SenateAuthors added Champion; Putnam
2021-02-18SenateReferred to Labor and Industry Policy
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1200 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback