MN HF1156 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Kiel
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Kiel
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota housing tax credit contribution fund established, tax credit for certain contributions provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota housing tax credit contribution fund established, tax credit for certain contributions provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] |
Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Steve Sandell [D] |
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Kiel |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Acomb |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Lesch |
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Huot |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Sandell |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Xiong, J. and Bahner |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Elkins and Petersburg |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Noor, Youakim, and Fabian |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF404 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Taxes