MN HF1156 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Kiel
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota housing tax credit contribution fund established, tax credit for certain contributions provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota housing tax credit contribution fund established, tax credit for certain contributions provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAuthor added Kiel
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Acomb
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Lesch
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Becker-Finn and Huot
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Sandell
2019-03-13HouseAuthors added Xiong, J. and Bahner
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Elkins and Petersburg
2019-02-18HouseAuthors added Noor, Youakim, and Fabian
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF404 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback