MN HF1075 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Language excluding retired principals who serve as a substitute principal removed from continuing education requirements.
Title
Language excluding retired principals who serve as a substitute principal removed from continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-03-04 | House | Author added Moran. |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1220 (Similar To) 2015-03-02 - Referred to Education