MN HF1071 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Author added Benson, J.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Author added Benson, J.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Autism spectrum disorder coverage provided.
Title
Autism spectrum disorder coverage provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Norton [D] | Rep. Nora Slawik [D] | Rep. Mindy Greiling [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] | Rep. Terry Morrow [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] |
Rep. Kory Kath [D] | Rep. Carly Melin [D] | Rep. Kathy Brynaert [D] | Rep. John Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | House | Author added Benson, J. |
2011-04-07 | House | Author added Brynaert |
2011-03-16 | House | Authors added Morrow, Simon, Kath and Melin |
2011-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1071&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF1071&version=0&session=ls87 |