MI SB1563 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; death; final disposition of fetal remains; define, and clarify authorization requirements. Amends secs. 2803, 2804, 2834 & 2848 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2803 et seq.) & adds secs. 2836 & 2854. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1561'10, SB 1562'10
Title
Health; death; final disposition of fetal remains; define, and clarify authorization requirements. Amends secs. 2803, 2804, 2834 & 2848 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2803 et seq.) & adds secs. 2836 & 2854. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1561'10, SB 1562'10
Sponsors
Sen. James Barcia [D] | Sen. Raymond Basham [D] | Sen. Alan Cropsey [R] | Sen. John Gleason [D] |
Sen. Tupac Hunter [D] | Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. Dennis Olshove [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-11-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Title Amended | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 537 Yeas 30 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended | |
2010-11-10 | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In | |
2010-11-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-10 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-10 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-03 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB5929 (Same As) 2010-03-10 - Printed Bill Filed 03/10/2010
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals, burial or cremation
Health, abortion
Health, children
Health, death
Health, other
Health, vital records
Torts, liability
Health, abortion
Health, children
Health, death
Health, other
Health, vital records
Torts, liability