MI SB1247 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; access to data from the Michigan automated prescription system (MAPS); modify to require the department of licensing and regulatory affairs to provide to department of state police through an application program interface. Amends secs. 7109 & 7333a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7109 & 333.7333a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1245'18
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; access to data from the Michigan automated prescription system (MAPS); modify to require the department of licensing and regulatory affairs to provide to department of state police through an application program interface. Amends secs. 7109 & 7333a of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7109 & 333.7333a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1245'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 741 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 741 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 741 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Shirkey |
Subjects
Controlled substances: other
Health: controlled substances
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (existing): state police
Health: controlled substances
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State agencies (existing): state police