MI SB1244 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0357'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0357'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government: liability; options for a governmental agency to provide legal representation to an employee or public official; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 1964 PA 170 (MCL 691.1408).
Title
Local government: liability; options for a governmental agency to provide legal representation to an employee or public official; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 1964 PA 170 (MCL 691.1408).
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 559 (Y: 69 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0357'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2020 01:34 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/30/2020 10:38 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 01:36 Pm |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 559 Yeas 69 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-12-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-10 | House | Received On 12/10/2020 |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 490 Yeas 23 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |