MI SB1234 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; membership; age and date requirement for entering school and being counted in membership; revise in school aid act. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606).
Title
School aid; membership; age and date requirement for entering school and being counted in membership; revise in school aid act. Amends sec. 6 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 679 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 679 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2012 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 679 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |