MI SB1219 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0479'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0479'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; sale of alcoholic beverages at university conference centers; expand. Amends sec. 513 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1513).
Title
Liquor; licenses; sale of alcoholic beverages at university conference centers; expand. Amends sec. 513 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1513).
Sponsors
Sen. Tory Rocca [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 915 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 864 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 671 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 864 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 671 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0479'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:28 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/24/2018 @ 11:01 Am |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2018 @ 3:14 Pm |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 915 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 864 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 671 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tory Rocca |