MI SB1150 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; fair employment practices; certain information related to employment records of a law enforcement employee; modify employer release. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1978 PA 397 (MCL 423.507 & 423.509).
Title
Labor; fair employment practices; certain information related to employment records of a law enforcement employee; modify employer release. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1978 PA 397 (MCL 423.507 & 423.509).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 691 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Received On 12/05/2018 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 691 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |