MI SB1102 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0381'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0381'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; other; applicants for home for the aged licensing; require to comply with same standards as their employees. Amends secs. 20102, 20104 & 21313 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20102 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1101'10
Title
Human services; other; applicants for home for the aged licensing; require to comply with same standards as their employees. Amends secs. 20102, 20104 & 21313 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20102 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1101'10
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0381'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:44 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 2:00 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/17/2010 @ 2:38 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-15 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 615 Yeas 94 Nays 1 | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-30 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-04-20 | Referred To Committee On Families And Children's Services | |
2010-04-20 | Read A First Time | |
2010-04-20 | Received On 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Passed Roll Call # 194 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-04-15 | Substitute S-3 Concurred In | |
2010-04-15 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-03-11 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-03-11 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-03-11 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred To Committee On Families And Human Services |
Subjects
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Human services, other
Senior citizens, other
State agencies (existing), human services
Human services, other
Senior citizens, other
State agencies (existing), human services