MI SB1097 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Assigned Pa 0091'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Assigned Pa 0091'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; use of gaming compact funds to establish college scholarships for students or graduates; allow. Amends sec. 11a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.11a).
Title
Education; school districts; use of gaming compact funds to establish college scholarships for students or graduates; allow. Amends sec. 11a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.11a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Assigned Pa 0091'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-15 | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/10/2010 @ 11:16 Am | |
2010-06-15 | Approved By Governor 6/10/2010 @ 10:01 Am | |
2010-06-08 | Presented To Governor 6/7/2010 @ 10:27 Am | |
2010-06-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-06-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-02 | Roll Call # 278 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-06-02 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2010-06-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-06-01 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-06-01 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-06-01 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 230 Yeas 97 Nays 7 | |
2010-06-01 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-06-01 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-06-01 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-06-01 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-05-19 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-03-11 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-03-11 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-11 | Received On 03/11/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Passed Roll Call # 109 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-03-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-03-09 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-02-02 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |