MI SB1077 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0400'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0400'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marihuana: other; marihuana registry fund revenue; transfer to the Michigan set aside fund for the 2020-2021 fiscal year. Amends sec. 6 of 2008 IL 1 (MCL 333.26426). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4980'19
Title
Medical marihuana: other; marihuana registry fund revenue; transfer to the Michigan set aside fund for the 2020-2021 fiscal year. Amends sec. 6 of 2008 IL 1 (MCL 333.26426). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4980'19
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hollier [D] | Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] | Sen. Dayna Polehanki [D] | Sen. Marshall Bullock [D] |
Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Sen. Stephanie Chang [D] | Sen. Curtis Hertel [D] | Sen. Winnie Brinks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 642 (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 573 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 573 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0400'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 01:32 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/04/2021 11:18 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 04:45 Pm |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-21 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-21 | House | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 642 Yeas 96 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-12-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-12-16 | House | Received On 12/16/2020 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 573 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Adam J. Hollier |