MI SB0933 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0481'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0481'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Worker's compensation; benefits; medical marihuana expenses incurred to treat work-related injury; exclude from reimbursement requirements. Amends 1969 PA 317 (MCL 418.101 - 418.941) by adding sec. 315a.
Title
Worker's compensation; benefits; medical marihuana expenses incurred to treat work-related injury; exclude from reimbursement requirements. Amends 1969 PA 317 (MCL 418.101 - 418.941) by adding sec. 315a.
Sponsors
Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Joseph Hune [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 745 (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 312 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 312 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0481'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:06 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:23 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2012 @ 10:20 Am |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 745 Yeas 77 Nays 31 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-08 | House | Received On 05/08/2012 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 312 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |