MI SB0927 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: school aid; fiscal year 2020-2021 omnibus appropriations for school aid, higher education, and community colleges; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: school aid; fiscal year 2020-2021 omnibus appropriations for school aid, higher education, and community colleges; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 395 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 151 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-01SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2020-10-01SenateAssigned Pa 0165'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-01SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 09/30/2020 02:34 Pm
2020-10-01SenateApproved By Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 09/30/2020 01:18 Pm
2020-09-29SenatePresented To Governor 09/28/2020 10:10 Am
2020-09-23SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-09-23SenateInserted Full Title
2020-09-15HouseReturned To Senate
2020-09-23HouseInserted Full Title
2020-09-23HouseConference Report Adopted Roll Call # 395 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2020-09-23HouseConference Report Received
2020-09-23SenateSenate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-23SenateConference Report Received In Senate
2020-09-22HouseHouse Conferees Named 09/22/2020: Reps. Shane Hernandez Aaron Miller Jon Hoadley
2020-09-23SenateReferred To Conference Committee
2020-09-22SenateSenate Named Conferees 09/22/2020: Sens. Jim Stamas, Wayne A Schmidt, Curtis Hertel
2020-09-16SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 298 Yeas 0 Nays 37 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-16SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In
2020-09-15HouseTitle Amended
2020-09-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 373 Yeas 58 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-09-15HouseRead A Third Time
2020-09-15HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-09-15HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-09-15HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-09-15HouseRead A Second Time
2020-09-15HousePlaced On Second Reading
2020-09-15HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2020-09-15HouseRule Suspended
2020-05-27HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2020-05-27HouseRead A First Time
2020-05-27HouseReceived On 05/27/2020
2020-05-27SenatePassed Roll Call # 151 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2020-05-27SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-05-27SenateRules Suspended
2020-05-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-05-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-05-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-05-20SenateRules Suspended
2020-05-20SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-SB-0927
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2020-SIB-0927.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBS-0927.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2020-SEBH-0927.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2020-SNB-0927.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0165.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-05-27-045.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-15-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-23-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-23-075.htm

Bill Comments

feedback