MI SB0903 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0371'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0371'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; alternate dispute resolution; uniform arbitration act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0901'12, SB 0902'12
Title
Civil procedure; alternate dispute resolution; uniform arbitration act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0901'12, SB 0902'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 816 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 645 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 352 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 645 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 352 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0371'12 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2012 @ 4:34 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/14/2012 @ 9:42 Am |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2012 @ 1:47 Pm |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Roll Call # 816 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-11-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-11-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-11-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 645 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-05-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-17 | House | Received On 05/17/2012 |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 352 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |