MI SB0874 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-29 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-29 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; child abuse or child neglect; failure to report suspected child abuse or neglect; increase penalties.
Title
Children; child abuse or child neglect; failure to report suspected child abuse or neglect; increase penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 412 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 151 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 151 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-05-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 412 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 151 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |