MI SB0855 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Human services: medical services; access to quality complex rehabilitation technology; provide for. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services: medical services; access to quality complex rehabilitation technology; provide for. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 307 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2020-09-16HouseRead A First Time
2020-09-16HouseReceived On 09/16/2020
2020-09-16SenatePassed Roll Call # 307 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-15SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-09-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-07-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-07-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-07-29SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-04-16SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2020-04-16SenateIntroduced By Senator Kevin Daley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback