MI SB0851 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5579
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5579
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Amends secs. 201 & 201a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1801 & 388.1801a).
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Amends secs. 201 & 201a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1801 & 388.1801a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 327 (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 288 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 248 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 288 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 248 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5579 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | House Conferees Named 05/23/2018: Reps. Chris Afendoulis Steve Marino Henry Yanez |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/23/2018: Sens. Darwin Booher Tonya Schuitmaker David Knezek |
2018-05-23 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/23/2018: Sens. Darwin Booher, Tonya Schuitmaker, David Knezek |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call # 327 Yeas 0 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-05-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-15 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-05-15 | House | Passed Roll Call # 288 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-05-08 | House | Received On 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 248 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |