MI SB0827 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; filing, storage, and notice rules regarding do-not-resuscitate orders and comfort or care plans and limitation of liability for providing a comfort or care measure; create. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1180 & 1181. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0784'18
Title
Education; school districts; filing, storage, and notice rules regarding do-not-resuscitate orders and comfort or care plans and limitation of liability for providing a comfort or care measure; create. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1180 & 1181. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0784'18
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 509 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 509 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Adopted |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |