MI SB0780 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Assigned Pa 0114'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Assigned Pa 0114'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; capital outlay; supplemental appropriations; provide for natural resources trust fund. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; capital outlay; supplemental appropriations; provide for natural resources trust fund. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 183 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 89 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 89 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0114'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/11/2014 @ 2:47 Pm |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/7/2014 @ 9:50 Am |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/1/2014 @ 10:17 Am |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-03-27 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 183 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-26 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2014-03-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Amended |
2014-03-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-03-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Received On 03/12/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 89 Yeas 33 Nays 2 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |