MI SB0726 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; carriers; motor carrier safety act; modify regulations. Amends sec. 1a of 1963 PA 181 (MCL 480.11a).
Title
Transportation; carriers; motor carrier safety act; modify regulations. Amends sec. 1a of 1963 PA 181 (MCL 480.11a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 363 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-29 | House | Received On 05/29/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 363 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |