MI SB0711 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
Pending: House Commerce And Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; authorities; port authority act; revise. Amends secs. 2, 8 & 9 of 1978 PA 639 (MCL 120.102 et seq.).
Title
State financing and management; authorities; port authority act; revise. Amends secs. 2, 8 & 9 of 1978 PA 639 (MCL 120.102 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 512 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Title Amended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 512 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |