MI SB0702 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: cosmetologists; minimum hours of training for licensure as instructor, manicurist, and esthetician; increase. Amends secs. 1206, 1209 & 1210 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1206 et seq.).
Title
Occupations: cosmetologists; minimum hours of training for licensure as instructor, manicurist, and esthetician; increase. Amends secs. 1206, 1209 & 1210 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1206 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Samir Singh [D] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 61 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2024-03-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-19 | House | Received On 03/19/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 61 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sam Singh |