MI SB0688 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 203'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 203'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; investments; reporting requirements of a local unit of government retirement system; revise. Amends secs. 13 & 20h of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133 & 38.1140h). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17
Title
Retirement; investments; reporting requirements of a local unit of government retirement system; revise. Amends secs. 13 & 20h of 1965 PA 314 (MCL 38.1133 & 38.1140h). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 491 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 491 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 203'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2017 @ 2:46 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2017 @ 7:44 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 9:36 Am |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2017-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2017-12-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2017-12-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Received On 12/07/2017 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 491 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Shirkey |
Subjects
Local government: other
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: health benefits
Retirement: investments
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: health benefits
Retirement: investments