MI SB0637 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0365'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0365'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Communications; telecommunications; permits, fees, right-of-way use, and other regulation of wireless service providers; standardize. Creates new act.
Title
Communications; telecommunications; permits, fees, right-of-way use, and other regulation of wireless service providers; standardize. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 647 (Y: 74 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 161 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 161 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0365'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/12/2018 @ 4:34 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/12/2018 @ 12:10 Pm |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:44 Am |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-11-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 647 Yeas 74 Nays 35 |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-10-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-10-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy Policy |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 161 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Joe Hune |