MI SB0589 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0090'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; other; operation of electric patrol vehicles on sidewalks; permit under certain circumstances and modify certain equipment requirements. Amends secs. 2, 4, 5 & 6 of 1997 PA 55 (MCL 257.1572 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; other; operation of electric patrol vehicles on sidewalks; permit under certain circumstances and modify certain equipment requirements. Amends secs. 2, 4, 5 & 6 of 1997 PA 55 (MCL 257.1572 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 144 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 16 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateAssigned Pa 0090'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:08 Pm
2018-04-10SenateApproved By Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:36 Pm
2018-03-20SenatePresented To Governor 3/19/2018 @ 2:16 Pm
2018-03-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-03-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-14SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-03-14SenateHouse Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 144 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-03-13HouseReturned To Senate
2018-03-13HouseInserted Full Title
2018-03-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 Yeas 106 Nays 3
2018-03-13HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseAmended
2018-03-08HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-01-18HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2018-01-18HouseRead A First Time
2018-01-18HouseReceived On 01/18/2018
2018-01-18SenatePassed Roll Call # 16 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-01-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2018-01-17SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2018-01-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-12-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-12-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-12-12SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-09-27SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2017-09-27SenateIntroduced By Senator Peter Macgregor

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0589
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0589.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0589.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0589.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0589.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0090.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-12-101.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-01-18-005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-27-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-13-027.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-14-028.htm

Bill Comments

feedback