MI SB0589 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; parental rights; grounds for termination of parental rights; expand to include certain victims of human trafficking. Amends sec. 19b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.19b).
Title
Children; parental rights; grounds for termination of parental rights; expand to include certain victims of human trafficking. Amends sec. 19b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.19b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 392 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-06-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-05 | House | Received On 06/05/2014 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 392 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Bruce Caswell |