MI SB0574 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; driver license; road test for commercial driver license; provide waiver for certain veterans. Amends sec. 312e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.312e).
Title
Traffic control; driver license; road test for commercial driver license; provide waiver for certain veterans. Amends sec. 312e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.312e).
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] | Sen. James Barcia [D] | Sen. Raymond Basham [D] | Sen. Alan Cropsey [R] |
Sen. Valde Garcia [R] | Sen. Wayne Kuipers [R] | Sen. Dennis Olshove [D] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2010-02-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-02-10 | Received On 02/10/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Passed Roll Call # 48 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-02-09 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-01-21 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-01-21 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-05-13 | Referred To Committee On Senior Citizens And Veterans Affairs |