MI SB0442 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0085'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Businesses; business corporations; general revisions to business corporation act; provide for. Amends secs. 131, 143, 151, 202, 217, 246, 282, 283, 286, 287, 288, 301, 302, 405, 407, 525, 611, 703a, 707, 746, 762, 764, 765, 778, 784, 922, 923, 1042, 1056 & 1060 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1131 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Businesses; business corporations; general revisions to business corporation act; provide for. Amends secs. 131, 143, 151, 202, 217, 246, 282, 283, 286, 287, 288, 301, 302, 405, 407, 525, 611, 703a, 707, 746, 762, 764, 765, 778, 784, 922, 923, 1042, 1056 & 1060 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1131 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 437 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateAssigned Pa 0085'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 2:58 Pm
2018-04-10SenateApproved By Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:16 Pm
2018-03-15SenatePresented To Governor 3/14/2018 @ 2:08 Pm
2018-03-08SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-03-08SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-08SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-03-07HouseReturned To Senate
2018-03-07HouseInserted Full Title
2018-03-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2018-03-07HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-11-01HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
2017-11-01HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-01HouseReceived On 11/01/2017
2017-11-01SenatePassed Roll Call # 437 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0
2017-10-31SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-10-31SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-10-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-10-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-10-19SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-06-08SenateReferred To Committee On Commerce
2017-06-08SenateIntroduced By Senator Michael Kowall

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0442
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0442.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0442.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0442.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0442.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0085.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-19-085.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-11-01-090.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-05-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-07-025.htm

Bill Comments

feedback