MI SB0429 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health; standardized prior authorization form for prescription drugs; require. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2212c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0430'11
Title
Insurance; health; standardized prior authorization form for prescription drugs; require. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2212c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0430'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 197 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-03-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-29 | House | Received On 03/29/2012 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 197 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |